TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC v. Electronic Payment Systems, LLC

Plaintiff: TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Electronic Payment Systems, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00155
Filed: January 26, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Defendant Electronic Payment Systems, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration. ORDER that the effective date of the Order, dated 1/28/11 102 , deemed to be 2/15/11. ORDER that the final paragraph on page six of the Order, dated 1/28/11 102 , is deleted in its entirety and replaced with the following paragraph (see order for details). ORDER that TSYS's request for an evidentiary hearing is denied. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/15/11.(TLJ)
February 1, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED by (Doc. 106) ORDER granting 104 Defendant Electronic Payment Systems, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration. ORDER that the effective date of the Order, dated 1/28/11 102 , deemed to be 1/31/11. ORDER that the final paragraph on page 6 of the Order, dated 1/28/11 102 , is deleted in its entirety and replaced with the following paragraph (see order for details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/31/11.(TLJ) Modified on 2/1/2011 (TLJ).
January 28, 2011 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Electronic Payment Systems, LLC's Supplemental Motion to Compel 85 is granted. ORDER that TSYS shall fully comply with the unsatisfied portion of the Arbitrator's Award within 90 days of this Order. ORDER that Defenda nt Electronic Payment Systems, LLC's Motion to Compel 63 is granted in part and denied in part. ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings 84 is denied. ORDER that Plaintiff's Supplement to its Motion to Stay 98 is denied and ordered stricken from the record (see order for full details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/28/11.(TLJ)
August 3, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Defendant Electronic Payment Systems, LLC's Motion for Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/2/10.(TLJ)
July 13, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Electronic Payment Systems, LLC's ("EPS") Motion 72 to Transfer Related Case is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order in Judge Campbell's case, CV 10-1060-PHX-DGC re (Doc. 10). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/13/10. (KMG)
May 4, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses; FURTHER ORDERED that dft's motion to amend judgment 39 is granted to the extent discussed above. FURTHER ORDERED denying 40 Combined Motion to Amend or Vacate Jud gment. FURTHER ORDERED striking 42 Motion for Judgment and 44 Amended Motion to Amend Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED granting 46 Motion to Strike Numbers 42 and 44 to the extent it is premised upon untimeliness. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter an amended final judgment.... (See document for full details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/4/10.(LAD)
October 22, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Electronic Payment Systems, LLCs Motion 15 for Summary Judgment is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff TSYS Acquiring Solution, LLC's Cross-Motion 20 for Summary Judgment is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/22/09.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC v. Electronic Payment Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brian J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Payment Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?