Proctor v. Schriro et al
Petitioner: Jerime Antwon Proctor
Respondent: Dora B. Schriro and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 2:2009cv00168
Filed: January 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING in its entirety the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 12 as the order of the Court. Overruling 13 Petitioner's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's R&R.Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied and dismissed 1 . Petitioner's Certificate of Appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are DENIED. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/29/10. (DMT)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Petitioner's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/23/09. (SAT)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the 1 PETITION and this order on respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 2/12/2009. (LAD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerime Antwon Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?