Salguero-Morales v. Napolitano, et al

Petitioner: Dilma Leticia Salguero-Morales
Respondent: Paul Babeu, Michael Mukasey, Katrina Kane and Janet Napolitano
Case Number: 2:2009cv00194
Filed: February 2, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee Office
County: Pinal
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference of this matter to Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin is withdrawn. Petitioner's 32 request for a stay of removal is granted to the extent that Petitioner may not be removed from the United States unless the BIA affirmatively dec lines to administratively close Petitioners immigration proceedings. Petitioner's 35 Motion to Order Immigration Judge to Hold a Custody Redetermination Hearing is denied. The Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 27) is granted and this matter is remanded to the BIA for a determination of whether Petitioner's immigration proceedings should be administratively closed. Respondents must provide a copy of this Order to the BIA forthwith. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 09/30/10. (ESL) (NOTE: see attached pdf for complete details)
September 18, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference of petitioner's motion for injunctive relief (emergency temporary restraining order) 32 to Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin is withdrawn. All other matters remain with the Magistrate Judge for disposition as appropriate. That a temporary stay of removal is granted to the extent that respondents are enjoined from removing petitioner Dilma Leticia Salguero-Morales (A074-422-045) from the US pending further order of the Court. The Clerk shall fax a copy of this order to the US Attorney, to the attention of Cynthia Parsons...and to District Counsel Patricia Vroom. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/18/2009. (LAD)
June 24, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to Magistrate Judge Jay R Irwin of Petitioner's Motion for Injunctive Relief 28 is withdrawn; all other matters in this case remain pending before the Magistrate Judge; Petitioner's Motion for Injunctive Relief (Emergency Temporary Restraining Order) 28 is denied without prejudice;. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/24/09.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salguero-Morales v. Napolitano, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Babeu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Mukasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katrina Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dilma Leticia Salguero-Morales
Represented By: John D Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?