Attorney Yellow Pages.com, LLC et al v. Advice Company, et al

Plaintiff: Attorney Yellow Pages.com, LLC and James Novak
Defendant: Advice Company
Case Number: 2:2009cv00282
Filed: February 11, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plas' 35 Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Counts or alternatively, Motion to Strike Counts 1 and 2 of Advice Company's Counterclaim, is denied. Pla's request for oral argument is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 06/29/09.(ESL)
June 9, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered - re: Approving 42 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/9/09. (see order for full details)(DMT, )
May 1, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Advice's 24 Motion to Stay Proceedings without prejudice. (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/1/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attorney Yellow Pages.com, LLC et al v. Advice Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney Yellow Pages.com, LLC
Represented By: John Lee Condrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Novak
Represented By: John Lee Condrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advice Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?