American Family Insurance Group v. Bergeson et al

Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Group
Defendant: Milo Bergeson, David Levengood, Joan Levengood and David K. and Joan Levengood, Trustees of the Levengood Family Living Trust
Case Number: 2:2009cv00360
Filed: February 23, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2012 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 134 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/19/2012.(NVO)
October 25, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 115 Motion for Reconsideration; denying as moot Defendants' 117 Motion for Expedited Consideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/10.(REW)
September 14, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 88 American Family's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 95 Defendants/Counterclaimants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 93 American Family's Motion to Strike testimony; denying as moot 98 American Family's motion to strike Defendants/Counterclaimants' cross-motion and denying 102 Defendants/Counterclaimants' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/13/10.(LSP)
July 14, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court will defer ruling on the motion to strike until it considers the motions for summary judgment 98 . The Court will, however, grant Plaintiff's request to permit a "combined reply/response" on July 30, 2010, Doc. 98 at 2. Defendants shall file a reply by August 9, 2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/10. (DMT)
April 14, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying 11 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Insurance Group v. Bergeson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Group
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Como
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milo Bergeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Levengood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Levengood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K. and Joan Levengood, Trustees of the Levengood Family Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?