N'Genuity Enterprises Co. v. Pierre Foods, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: N'Genuity Enterprises Co.
Defendant: Timothy Denning, Jane Doe Denning, Pierre Foods, Inc., Norb Woodhams, Jr., Woodhams Jane Doe, Norb Woodhams, Sr. and Jane Doe Woodhams
Case Number: 2:2009cv00385
Filed: February 25, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Dismiss. The following claims are dismissed. In all other respects, the Motion is denied. Claims 1 and 2 are dismissed as against the Individual Defendants with prejudice. As against Pierre Fo ods, Claims 1 and 2 are not dismissed to the extent only that these counts are based on the Pierre Foods' post-discharge conduct. As against Pierre Foods, the Court reiterates that Claim 5 has been dismissed with prejudice. Claims 3,4 and the re mainder of Claim 5 are not dismissed only to the extent that any claims may not have been fairly cotemplated prior to the discharge date. Claim 9 is dismissed as against Defendants Woodhams Jr. and Woodhams Sr. without prejudice. Claim 11 is dismissed as against Defendant Denning only. Claim 12 is dismised as against the Individual Defendants Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/30/10.(TLJ)
January 5, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion 48 for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/5/10.(KMG)
October 5, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants file a response to the 48 MOTION for Clarification and/or Reconsideration on or before 10/22/09. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/2/09. (REW, )
September 9, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss; Claim Five (fraudulent inducement) against Pierre Foods is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; all claims against Pierre Foods based on events occurring prior to 12/12/08, are DISMISSED WITH PR EJUDICE; Claim Two (breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing) against all Defendants is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to the extent that it relies on pre-contract actions; Claim Three (fraudulent misrepresentation) against all Defendants, Claim F our (fraudulent concealment and nondisclosure) against all Defendants, and Claim Five (fraudulent inducement) against the Individual Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Claim Nine (defamation, libel, and slander) and Claim Ten (trade libel and slander) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent that they are asserted against Defendants Woodhams Sr and Woodhams Jr. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/99/09.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N'Genuity Enterprises Co. v. Pierre Foods, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierre Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norb Woodhams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodhams Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norb Woodhams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Woodhams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N'Genuity Enterprises Co.
Represented By: Cober C Plucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?