Hobe v. United States Department of Education et al

Plaintiff: Marc Hobe
Defendant: United States Department of Education, Pioneer Recovery, James Farrar, John Does I-X, Jane Doe I-X, Unknown Corporation I-X and Unknown Government Agency I-X
Case Number: 2:2009cv00405
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 20:1080 Student Loan Recovery

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/21/10.(TLJ)
November 3, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Pla's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/2/09. (SAT)
October 26, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The 32 Motion to Dismiss filed by the United States Dept of Education and James Farrar is granted. The Court will set a case management conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/26/09. (SAT)
September 4, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall, by September 18, 2009, file a response to themotion to dismiss 32 and a response to the notice of suggestion of bankruptcy 31 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/4/09. (DMT, )
June 16, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pla's complaint (Dkt. #1) is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Pla has until July 17, 2009 to file an amended complaint consistent with this order. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action without further notice if Pla fails to comply with this deadline. All pending motions are denied as moot 28 . Possible Dismissal due by 7/17/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/09. (KMG, ) .
May 5, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification and Hearing. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 19 in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/5/09.(TLJ)
April 29, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dfts shall file a response to Pla's motion 12 for clarification by May 1, 2009. Pla's motion 14 to compel disclosures and set this matter for trial is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/28/09.(KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobe v. United States Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Hobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Corporation I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Government Agency I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?