Armored Group, LLC v. Supreme Industries, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Armored Group, LLC
Defendant: Supreme Industries, Inc., Supreme Corporation of Texas and Black and White Business Entities 1-5
Case Number: 2:2009cv00414
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2011 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - setting a status conference for January 28, 2011, at 2:15 p.m. on the disqualification of the undersigned judge and/or the propriety association of the firm of Fennemore Craig, PC, in this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/24/11. (KMG)
November 16, 2010 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION that Defendants' 188 Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Michael A. Fahlmans Lost Profits Damages Testimony is denied. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/15/10.(ESL)
October 6, 2010 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 153 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot the 183 Motion to Strike. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/6/10.(LAD)
June 24, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Supreme's 103 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is denied. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 06/23/10.(ESL)
February 22, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Armored Group's Motion 76 for Sanctions is Denied. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/22/10.(KMG)
August 17, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss 37 is granted with respect to Count Four of the First Amended Complaint and is denied in all other respects. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend its complaint at to Count Four by August 21, 2009. Defendants' motion to transfer venue 37 is denied. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/17/09.(DMT, )
May 15, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Defendant Supreme Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Case and granting 10 Defendant Supreme Corporation of Texas's Motion to Dismiss Case. Plaintiff The Armored Group, LLC is granted leave to amend its complaint by May 29, 2009. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case will be dismissed without prejudice if Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint by May 29, 2009. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/14/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armored Group, LLC v. Supreme Industries, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Abram N Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Corporation of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black and White Business Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armored Group, LLC
Represented By: Sharad H Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?