Robinson v. Heritage Elementary School et al

Plaintiff: Donna Mae Robinson
Defendant: Heritage Elementary School, Aaron Robinson and Paulette Robinson
Case Number: 2:2009cv00541
Filed: March 17, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Defendant Heritage Elementary School's Motion to Dismiss. That Plaintiff's request for oral argument, 54 at 1, is DENIED as unnecessary. Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice, 55 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.That Defendant Heritage Elementary School's Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice, 56 , is SUSTAINED to the erroneous date of "December 8, 2008" as the date Plaintiff was authorized to file this lawsuit. All other objections are overruled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/14/10.(DMT)
February 1, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's request for leave to amend the Amended Complaint, docket # 35 at 8-9, is GRANTED. Pursuant to LRCiv 15.1, as amended on December 1, 2009, Pla "must file and serve [the Second Amended Complaint, lodged as docket # 44] on a ll parties under Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the order granting leave to amend.... LRCiv 15.1. (emphasis added). FURTHER ORDERED that Dft's Motions to Dismiss, docket # 29 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/31/10.(KMG)
June 3, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pla's ineffective service on dfts is hereby QUASHED. FURTHER ORDERED that pla shall hve 60 days from the date of the entry of this order to either (1) properly serve all 3 dfts in accordance with applicable federal or Arizona law, or (2) obtain and file waivers of service as Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(d) allows. Absent good cause shown, pla's failure to properly serve all dfts within this deadline shall result in dismissal of this case or dismissal of any unserved dft. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/2/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Heritage Elementary School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Mae Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Elementary School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulette Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?