Curreri v. Babue et al

Plaintiff: Gerlando Curreri
Defendant: Paul Babue, Chris Vasquez, Terry Altman, Long, Devanah Johnson, Unknown Officer and Unknown Nurse
Case Number: 2:2009cv00630
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's motion for a 30 day extension of time to file a reply in support of several of his pending motions 170 is denied; Plaintiff's motion to continue trial date 158 and motion for specific trial date 159 are granted to the limited extent that trial in this case is continued from 3/26/13 to Monday, August 5, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. ; the motions are denied in all other respects; Plaintiff's motion to waive costs 157 is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff making a showing on an item by item basis of exactly which costs he is seeking to have waived and why such waiver is necessary for his case; Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel 157 is denied; Plaintiff's motion for status review 161 is denied; granting Plaintiff's motion to exclude defense witnesses from the courtroom during trial 162 ; this Order is without prejudice to defense counsel raising at the time of trial whether the defense expert(s) should be allowed in the courtroom for the entire trial. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/5/13. (REW)
October 31, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Johnson's 131 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/31/12.(REW)
September 11, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 119 ; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 119 is granted in part and denied in part; Jackson and Valenzuela are entitled to summa ry judgment and are dismissed from this action along with Counts 6, 7, and 14; Johnson is entitled to summary judgment as to Plaintiff's claim that he was improperly denied surgery; the motion is otherwise denied; the remaining claims are Counts 4 and 5 against Johnson for deliberate indifference to Plaintiff's pain; Plaintiff's Motion for Status 128 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/10/12. (REW)
September 19, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/19/11.(REW)
April 19, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Plaintiff's Motion to Cease and Desist; denying Plaintiff's 62 Motion to Cease and Desist. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/19/11.(REW)
March 17, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, accepting and adopting the Magistrate's 57 Report and Recommendation with the slight modification to eliminate the suggestion that the undersigned deny a certificate of appealability should Plaintiff s eek one because a certificate of appealability pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2254 does not apply outside of certain habeas writs; denying Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/16/11. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curreri v. Babue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerlando Curreri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Babue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devanah Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?