Bickler, et al v. Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Plaintiff: Philip Bickler, Gordon Allison, David Bickler and Stephen Bickler
Defendant: Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Case Number: 2:2009cv00726
Filed: April 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER re final conference held on 10/20/2010. Reaffirming trial to begin 10/26/2010. See order for additional information. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/22/2010. (NVO)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 154 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/8/2010.(NVO)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/2010.(NVO)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/2010.(NVO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bickler, et al v. Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Bickler
Represented By: Janelle M Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Allison
Represented By: Herbert L Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bickler
Represented By: Herbert L Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bickler
Represented By: Herbert L Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Represented By: Bruce C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?