Udoh v. Glencroft

Plaintiff: Patricia Udoh
Defendant: Glencroft
Case Number: 2:2009cv00908
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Strike responses to written discovery 39 , 38 , 37 ; granting 49 Motion to Quash. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/21/10.(LAD)
July 6, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Defendant's Motion to Amend and granting 64 Defendant's Motion for Summary Disposition. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/5/10.(LSP)
December 17, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) - IT IS SO ORDERED: Dft's 12 Motion to dismiss is denied. The Clerk of Court shall send Pla a service packet including the 1 Complaint, this order, and a Summons and Request for Waiver form for Dft Glencroft. Pla must c omplete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of the date of filing of this order. Service Packet due by 1/15/2010. Dft must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If the Clerk of Court does not receive the completed service packet from Pla within 30 days of the date of this order, the Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/17/09. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Udoh v. Glencroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Udoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glencroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?