Loza v. American Heritage Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michael Loza
Defendant: American Heritage Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2009cv01118
Filed: May 26, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendant American Heritage's 96 motion for summary judgment is granted. Plaintiff Michael Loza's 102 cross motion for partial summary judgment is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 03/26/12. (ESL)
February 25, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - American Heritage's motion 46 for summary judgment is granted. Loza's motion 48 for partial summary judgment is denied. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/24/10.(KMG)
December 9, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/9/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loza v. American Heritage Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Loza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Heritage Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Travis Monroe Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?