Hansen v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Karen Marie Hansen
Defendant: Charles Ryan, Therese Schroeder, Mitchell and Mims
Case Number: 2:2009cv01290
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' 80 Motion; Defendants' 80 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/30/2012.(LFIG)
October 3, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Strike; denying as moot Defendants' 71 Motion to Strike; denying Defendants' 67 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/3/11.(REW)
August 17, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 52 ; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 52 is denied; leave of the Court is granted to Defendants to take Plaintiff's deposition within 45 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/17/11.(REW)
November 3, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet)- IT IS ORDERED: Dfts Jones and Backes are dismissed without prejudice from Counts One and Two. Dfts Garcia, Jones, and Backes are dismissed without prejudice from Count Four. The following Dfts must answer the following Counts: a. Count One - Dfts Rahman, Mims, and Mitchell;b. Count Two - Dfts Rahman, Mims, and Mitchell; c. Count Three - Dfts Rahman, Mitchell, Mims, Thornton, Garcia, Jones, and Backes; and d. Count Four - Dfts Rahman, Mitchell, Mims, and Thorton. The Cler k of Court must send Pla a service packet including the 10 First Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dfts Jones, Mitchell, Rahman, Mims, and Thorton, Garcia, and Backes. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. Service Packet due by 11/23/2009. Dfts must answer the First Amended Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/3/09. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Marie Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therese Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?