Gorilla Companies LLC v. Van Tassel et al

Plaintiff: Gorilla Companies LLC
Defendant: 13 Holdings LLC, Robb M Corwin, Jillian C Corwin, Sharon Van Tassel and Darrell Van Tassel
Debtor: Blue Room Creative LLC, Gorilla Companies Incorporated, Professional Event Management LLC and Gorilla Fuel LLC
Trustee: United States Trustee
Case Number: 2:2009cv01327
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The withdrawal of reference of the adversary proceeding (Doc. 21 ) is vacated in part and the case referred back to the bankruptcy court for resolution of the pending motions for summary judgment. Plaintiff shall file a status report within 10 days after the motions for summary judgment have been resolved. Plaintiff's motion for entry of order clarifying status of reference (Doc. 37 ) is granted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/31/11. (SAT)
December 22, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED: Pla Gorilla Companies LLC's unopposed motion for default jgm against Dft 13, LLC (Doc. 30 ) is granted. Pursuant to Rule 55(b), default jgm in the amount of $602,841.00 is entered in favor of Pla Gorilla Companies LLC and against Dft 13, LLC. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/22/10. (SAT)
October 14, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that reference of the adversary proceeding (Doc. 17 ) is withdrawn. The Parties shall appear at a Status Conference on 11/9/2010 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/14/10. (SAT)
September 16, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to the 17 Notice of no Objection to Withdrawal, MOTION (Request) for setting of Final Pretrial Conference on or berfore 10/1/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/16/10. (SAT)
June 22, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 12 Defendants' Renewed Motion to Withdraw the reference from bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/22/10. (DMT)
October 2, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 2 Motion to Withdraw the Reference from Bankruptcy Court filed by Dfts Sharon Van Tassel and Darrel Van Tassel is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/02/09.(ESL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorilla Companies LLC v. Van Tassel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Blue Room Creative LLC
Represented By: John R Clemency
Represented By: Craig Solomon Ganz
Represented By: Janel Marie Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gorilla Companies Incorporated
Represented By: John R Clemency
Represented By: Craig Solomon Ganz
Represented By: Janel Marie Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Professional Event Management LLC
Represented By: John R Clemency
Represented By: Craig Solomon Ganz
Represented By: Janel Marie Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gorilla Fuel LLC
Represented By: John R Clemency
Represented By: Craig Solomon Ganz
Represented By: Janel Marie Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Larry Lee Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13 Holdings LLC
Represented By: Todd Feltus
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robb M Corwin
Represented By: Todd Feltus
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian C Corwin
Represented By: Todd Feltus
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Van Tassel
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Todd Feltus
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Van Tassel
Represented By: Todd Feltus
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gorilla Companies LLC
Represented By: Aaron Schepler
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Janel Marie Glynn
Represented By: Craig Solomon Ganz
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?