Wilkins v. Maricopa County et al

Plaintiff: Brian A Wilkins
Defendant: Maricopa County, Joseph M Arpaio and X-Ray Technician
Case Number: 2:2009cv01380
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying as moot Defendant Maricopa County's 173 Motion to Strike in light of the entry of Judgment in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/8/11.(REW)
June 7, 2011 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants Sheriff Joseph Arpaio and Darren Dauch's 159 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing the Clerk to terminate this action and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/7/11.(REW)
May 27, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Defendant Maricopa County's 156 Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's claims against Maricopa County are dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/27/11.(REW)
June 2, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Defendant Maricopa County's Motion to Compel. Banner Desert Medical Center; Dr. Alan Walsh; Dr. Gregory Patchen; Walgreens Pharmacy; Medco Health; and A.S.U.s Health Center shall provide complete c opies of Plaintiff's healthcare records, including his mental healthcare records, from June 29, 2004 to June 1, 2010 to counsel for Maricopa County upon service of a subpoena duces tecum and a certified copy of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions against Maricopa County. See PDF document for deatails. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/1/10.(LSP)
April 7, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; it is granted solely to the extent that Darren Dauch is added as a defendant, and the failure-to-train claim asserted in Count Three o f the Second Amended Complaint is added and it is denied as to all other respects. The Clerk shall file 81 Plaintiff's lodged proposed Second Amended Complaint. See PDF document for details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk shall send Plaintiff a service packet for Defendant Darren Dauch. Plaintiff shall complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of the Court within twenty (20) days of filing of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Darren Dauch shall file his written election to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States district judge within 14 days of his appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/6/10.(LSP)
January 26, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Request for Defendants to Produce Electronically Stored Information and Other Tangible Items, 45 , deemed a motion to compel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/25/10.(DMT)
December 21, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, the Clerk shall file 29 the proposed First Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts Two and Three of the First Amended Complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's allegations asserting the rights of detainees other than himself are DISMISSED with prejudice. If Plaintiff fails to prov ide a full name and address for the unknown Jail Guard by February 20, 2010, his claims against unknown Jail Guard may be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 14 Maricopa County's Motion to Dismiss Case; 19 Defe ndant Arpaio's Motion to Dismiss Case; Defendant Arpaio's and Maricopa County's 33 and 35 Motions for Summary Disposition and 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Request for Summary Disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/21/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Maricopa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X-Ray Technician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?