Dowling et al v. Arpaio et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Dowling and Dennis Dowling
Defendant: Joseph Arpaio, Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, Maricopa County, Ava Arpaio, John Does I-X, Jane Does I-X, Black Corporations I-V and White Partnerships I-V
Case Number: 2:2009cv01401
Filed: July 2, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2012 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Arpaio Defendants' 211 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted; that the Maricopa County Defendants' Second 212 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Defendants accordingly. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 03/14/2012. (ESL)
February 1, 2012 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 227 Motion to Strike is denied; that the Board Defendants' 237 Motion to Strike is denied; that oral argument is vacated on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and the Board Defendants' Motion to Strike. Howev er, oral argument on the remaining pending Motions (Docs. 211 and 212) is still set for 03/05/12 at 11:00 a.m. It is finally ordered that Plaintiffs and Defendants shall have 15 days from the date of this Order to file any objections/disputes to the 30 additional facts referred to in the Arpaio Defendants' Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or the Omnibus Statement of Facts if such objection/dispute is not already set forth in the record. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 02/01/12. (ESL)
November 17, 2011 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Arpaio Defendants' 199 Motion to Strike Portions of D.P. Van Blaricom's Supplemental Expert Report is denied; the parties shall have until 12/16/11 to depose Plaintiffs' expert, D.P. Van Blaricom; vacating oral argum ent on Defendants' 199 Motion to Strike and continuing oral argument on the follow pending motions: the Arpaio Defendants' Second 211 Motion for Summary Judgment, the Maricopa County Defendants' Second 212 Motion for Summary Jud gment, Plaintiffs' 227 Motion to Strike 232 Statements of Fact, and the Maricopa County Defendants' 237 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Omnibus Statement of Facts from 1/17/12 to 03/05/12 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 503, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/17/11. (see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
July 1, 2011 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 195 Motion to extend the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines is denied. This denial is without prejudice to Plaintiffs seeking other sanctions if Defendants failed to comply with the discovery rules or supplement their discovery responses. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 07/01/11. (ESL)
April 15, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Noyes's 128 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Ted Noyes is GRANTED except for the limited purpose of seeking factual information of which Noyes is the only source. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 04/15/11.(ESL)
March 8, 2011 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Arpaio Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment 56 is granted in part with respect to Counts I and III of the Complaint, and denied in part with respect to Counts IV, V and VI. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/8/11.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowling et al v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Arpaio
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava Arpaio
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Corporations I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Partnerships I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?