Eason et al v. MTC FINANCIAL INC dba TRUSTEE CORPS. et al

Plaintiff: William J Eason and Erie Lee Eason
Defendant: MTC FINANCIAL INC dba TRUSTEE CORPS., IndyMac Federal Bank, F.S.B. and MERS
Case Number: 2:2009cv01423
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's motions for reconsideration (Doc. 66, 68), which the Court interprets as motions for corrections pursuant to Rule 60(a), are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that, as this Order supercedes the June 4, 2010 Order (Doc. 64), the June 4, 2 010 Judgment (Doc. 65) is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla's motion for default judgment (Doc. 63) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla's Motion to Correct the Record to Reflect the Proper Name of Dft Entity to its Formal Appellation, re: IndyMac Mortgage Services, a division of One West Bank FSB (Doc. 67) is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of Dfts and close the case. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/5/10.(KMG)
June 4, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Default Judgment; directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/4/10.(REW)
April 6, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that MERS's 30 motion to dismiss based on Rule 12(b)(6) is granted; MERS's 30 motion to dismiss based on Rule 12(b)(5) is denied; that MTC's 29 motion to dismiss based on Rule 12(b)(6) is granted; MTC's 29 motion for fees and costs is denied without prejudice, with leave to re-file pursuant to LRCiv 54.2; that the Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal, with prejudice, as to MERS and MTC; that Pla has 30 days to re-move for an entry of default under Rule 55(a) against the two remaining dfts, Homeplaceloans.com and IndyMac Bank FSB. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 04/05/10. (ESL)
September 3, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Summary Disposition; granting 11 Motion to Dismiss based on 9(b) and 12(b)(b) and denying without prejudice MERS' motion to dismiss 11 based on 12(b)(5); granting 14 Motion to Dismiss; MTC motion for fees and costs 14 is denied; denying 18 Motion for Judgment. Pla has 30 days to file an amended complaint to cure the deficiencies identified herein. If pla fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court shall, without further Court order, enter judgment of dismissal, with prejudice as to this entire case. FURTHER ORDERED in addition to filing an amended complaint within 30 days, pla must complete service and file the required proofs of service....Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/2/2009.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eason et al v. MTC FINANCIAL INC dba TRUSTEE CORPS. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Lee Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC FINANCIAL INC dba TRUSTEE CORPS.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Federal Bank, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?