Williams v. Mesa City of et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Williams
Defendant: Mesa City of, Mesa Police Department, City of, John Santiago, John Doe I-X, Jane I-X Doe, ABC - XYZ Corporations and Black and White Partnerships
Case Number: 2:2009cv01511
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. See PDF document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/8/11.(LSP)
February 14, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's request to amend the Complaint to allege a Monell claim is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 02/14/11. (ESL)
January 28, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's counsel must promptly provide a complete copy of this order to his client, Cynthia Williams, and promptly thereafter file a notice of compliance with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/28/11. (REW)
January 19, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 44 Response to City Defendant's (sic) Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby STRICKEN without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall re-file Plaintiff's Response to City Defendant's (sic) Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 01/25/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 01/18/11. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
July 15, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Stipulation/motion to extend the Rule 16 discovery and dispositive motion deadlines. That defense counsel shall "use proper capitalization," i.e., use proper upper and lower case type to denote the correct spelling of the party names, in all future captions as mandated by LRCiv 7.1(a)(3). Future violations of the Local Rules may result in the striking of the non-conforming motion, brief or other document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/15/10. (DMT)
August 18, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants City of Mesa's and City of Mesa Police Department's Motion to Dismiss 2 is granted to the extent that Plaintiff's claims against the City of Mesa Police Department are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Motion to Dismiss 2 is denied in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/17/09.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Mesa City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa City of
Represented By: Marc Thomas Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Police Department, City of
Represented By: Marc Thomas Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane I-X Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC - XYZ Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black and White Partnerships
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?