Jallayou v. Kimble et al
Petitioner: Eric Jallayou
Respondent: James Kimble, Katrina Kane, Janet Napolitano, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Diane J. Humetewa
Case Number: 2:2009cv01592
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Presiding Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, adopting the 17 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as the order of this Court; granting Petitioner's 12 Motion to Withdraw Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed with prejudice; denying as moot Petitioner's 10 Motion to Consolidate Cases; directing the Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/2/09. (REW, )
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS RECOMMENDED that Mr. Jallayou's 12 MOTION to Withdraw his Petition be granted and the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed with prejudice as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 8/31/09. (SAT)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Petitioner's motions for joinder of parties ( 4 and 9 ) are denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion to consolidate. The Clerk of Court must a copy of the summons , petition 1 and this order upon the US Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk. The Clerk must also send by certified mail a copy of the summons, petition and this order to the US Attorney Genera l and respondents. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/11/2009. (LAD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jallayou v. Kimble et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Jallayou
Represented By: Kara Lee Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katrina Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diane J. Humetewa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?