Diamond et al v. OneWest Bank, FSB et al

Plaintiff: Matthew D Diamond and Susan E Diamond
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2009cv01593
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 69 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/2/10.(REW)
May 28, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING Pla's 62 Motion for Reconsideration and amending our 61 order dated 4/29/2010, to provide that beginning 6/1/2010, and continuing on the 1st day of each month thereafter, pla shall make 13 monthly payments to t he court in the amount of $2,142.85, with the final payment of $2,142.95 on 7/1/2011, until the $30,000 bond requirement is satisfied in full. Each payment must be in guaranteed funds and accompanied by a Notice of Deposit filed with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/27/10. (SAT)
April 29, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion for TRO; granting 52 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 59 Motion for Hearing on Motion; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/29/10.(LAD)
January 25, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dfts' 32 motion to amend its motion to dismiss. The clerk shall file the supplemental briefing attached as exhibit 1 to doc. 32. It is ordered denying plas' 17 motion for hearing, and denying plas' 17 motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 01/25/10.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond et al v. OneWest Bank, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew D Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan E Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?