Longariello v. Phoenix Union High School District

Plaintiff: Steve J Longariello
Defendant: Phoenix Union High School District
Case Number: 2:2009cv01606
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED, nunc pro tunc, that the Court's 9/2/09 8 Order,at 3-4, striking Pla's 1 Complaint, is hereby VACATED. Pla's 1 Complaint, is REINSTATED, effective the date it was originally filed, 8/4/09. FURTHER ORDERED th at Dft Phoenix Union High School District's 13 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Finding that Pla's 10 Amended Complaint fails to state any claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), FED.R.CIV.P., and pro se Pla havin g received a fair opportunity to file an Amended Complaint to cure the original Complaint's factual deficiencies, dismissal is with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter jgm in favor of Dft Phoenix UnionHigh School District and to terminate this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/15/09. (SAT)
November 13, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Motion for Judgment by Default, combined with Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss, 18 are summarily DENIED. In an abundance of fairness, the Court hereby authorizes pro se Plaintiff to fi le a Supplemental Response to the merits of Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss, docket # 13 , on or before Monday, November 30, 2009 or Defendant's Motion to Dismiss will be granted and this case terminated in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/13/09.(DMT, )
September 2, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED 12/15/09 PER 25 ORDER - ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Pla's 1 COMPLAINT is hereby STRICKEN for failure to comply with Rule 8, FED.R.CIV.P., and failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla may file an A mended Complaint that shall fully comply with Rule 8, FED.R.CIV.P., by Friday, 10/2/09. Pla is directed to attach a copy of the EEOC Right to Sue letter as an exhibit to the Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that if no Amended Complaint is filed by Friday, 10/2/09, the Clerk is hereby directed to dismiss this case without prejudice and further notice. Possible Dismissal deadline set for 10/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/1/09. (SAT) Modified on 12/15/2009 (SAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longariello v. Phoenix Union High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve J Longariello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Union High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?