Atalla v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Petitioner: Jamal Atalla
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and John Kramer
Case Number: 2:2009cv01610
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Respondents' 121 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment is denied. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/18/12. (NKS)
December 15, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Petitioner's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses 103 is granted in the amount of $126,721.42; the Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Petitioner Jamal Atalla, M.D., against Respondents John Kramer, District Director of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, in his official capacity, and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services for attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs in the amount of $126,721.42, plus interest at the federal rate until paid. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/14/11. (REW)
June 20, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER, Plaintiff's application for naturalization is granted; the Clerk shall enter judgment granting Plaintiff's application for naturalization; the Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/20/11. (REW)
March 12, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Respondents' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Stay of Discovery issued December 2, 2009 (doc. #19) is lifted and discovery may proceed. By separate order, the Court will set a Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/12/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atalla v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamal Atalla
Represented By: Debra Ann Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?