April v. America West/U.S. Airways

Plaintiff: Pamela D April
Defendant: America West/U.S. Airways
Case Number: 2:2009cv01707
Filed: August 18, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER, re: 79 Order; Defendant US Airways, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment 71 is granted; the Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and terminate this case; the Clerk is directed to file an Amended Judgment and provide the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this Amended Order and Amended Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/7/11. (REW)
January 10, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion of US Airways, Inc. for Summary Jgm pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56, doc. 71 , is GRANTED and that the Clerk of Court shall enter jgm in favor of Dft and terminate this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/9/11. (SAT)
July 29, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 07/28/10.(ESL)
July 21, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 52 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Non-Uniform Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/21/10.(REW)
April 2, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pla's 32 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/1/10.(LAD)
March 23, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dft's Motion 26 to Amend Answer to Complaint, is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that, consistent with LRCiv 15.1, on or before Thursday, April 8, 2010, Dft shall file the Amended Answer, which it submitted as Exhibit 1 in support of its Motion to Amend, and shall serve Pla pursuant to Rule 5,FED.R.CIV.P., within this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/23/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: April v. America West/U.S. Airways
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela D April
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America West/U.S. Airways
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?