United States of America v. Toyota Sequoia 2005, VIN:5TDZT38AX5S239010

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Toyota Sequoia 2005, VIN:5TDZT38AX5S239010
Case Number: 2:2009cv02012
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking Mr. Singh's claim to the Property. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED forfeiting the Property to United States of America. The Government shall file a proposed form of judgment for entry by the Court within five (5) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Final Pretrial Conference currently set for 10:00 a.m. on December 19, 2011. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/6/2011. (KMG)
June 30, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Reconsider to the limited extent set out in this Order and Denying the Motion to Reconsider in all other respects. It is further ordered Denying Plaintiff's 27 First Motion for Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 06/30/11. (ESL)
October 25, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Claim and Answer of Mukhtiar Singh. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/25/10.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Toyota Sequoia 2005, VIN:5TDZT38AX5S239010
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Wendy L Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Sequoia 2005, VIN:5TDZT38AX5S239010
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?