Surowiec v. Capital Title Agency, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James M Surowiec
Defendant: Capital Title Agency, Inc. and Scott Romley
Case Number: 2:2009cv02153
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 79) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted with respect to punitive damages and denied as to compensatory damages. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 92) is denied. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions for spoliation of evidence (Docs. 82, 97) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions pursuant to Rule 37 and the Court's inherent powe rs (Doc. 97) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. Plaintiff's motion to strike reply brief (Doc. 114) is denied. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. By separate order the Court will also require the parties, during the month of June, to hold a settlement conference with Ninth Circuit mediators in Phoenix. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/4/11.(KMG)
April 29, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/29/2010.(NVO)
March 30, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file the proposed amended complaint 19 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/29/10.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surowiec v. Capital Title Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M Surowiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Title Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Romley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?