M & I Bank, FSB v. COUGHLIN et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02282
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2012 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The request for consideration in 200 M&I's trial brief, treated as a motion for reconsideration, is DENIED. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/19/12. (NKS)
February 24, 2012 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff M&I Bank's motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 152 ) is DENIED with respect to its third and fourth causes of action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that summary judgment is GRANTED in favor of Defendant Blue Brick Financial and against Plaintiff M&I Bank with respect to M&I Bank's third and fourth causes of action. FURTHER ORDERED that "Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude All Information, Statements, Purported Evidence of Any Kind That: (1) Plaintiff 's Origination, Including Underwriting and its Lending Processes Was the Cause of the Loss; (2) Any Derogatory Comments Concerning the Loan Type or Product; and (3) the Defense of Contributory And/or Comparative Fault" (Doc. 105 ) and "Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Michael Yancey" (Doc. 106 ) are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/24/2012.(KMG)
November 10, 2011 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants Lawyers Title Insurance Company and Vicki Collier's motion to strike M&Is second amended memorandum of law in support of motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 162) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that Plaintiff M&I Bank's motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 152) is GRANTED with respect to its eleventh cause of action (against Defendants James and Janae Jarnagin) and its ninth cause of action (against Defendants Lawyers Tit le Insurance Company and Vicki Collier), and otherwise remains under advisement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Lawyers Title Insurance Company and Vicki Collier's cross motion for summary judgment (Doc. 120) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that, by December 2, 2011, Defendant Blue Brick shall submit a brief.... IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff M&I Bank shall respond to Blue Brick's brief by December 16, 2011, and Blue Brick may reply by January 11, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument currently scheduled forDecember 14, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. is VACATED. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/9/11.(LAD)
August 9, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 80 Defendants Lawyers Title Insurance Company and Vicki Collier's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, in which Defendant Blue Brick Financial, LLC and Defendants James and Janae Jarnigan joined (Docs. 81, 95), is DENIED. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/9/11. (NKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M & I Bank, FSB v. COUGHLIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?