Shivers v. Phoenix Police Department, City of et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02285
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Notices are granted in part and denied in part (Doc. 17-19). The Notices are granted to the extent that Plaintiff seeks clarification and otherwise denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/3/11. (TLJ)
September 8, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the First Amended Complaint and this action are dismissed. (Doc. 6.); Plaintiff's 14 motion to stop litigation fees is denied. The Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action and that the dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 09/08/10. (ESL)
March 4, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): Pla's 2nd application to proceed in forma pauperis (ifp) is denied as moot. Counts I and II and dfts City of Phoenix Police Department, Kamp and Nolder are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk must send pla a service pa cket...for dft Diaz. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings. Service Packet due by 3/24/2010. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/4/10. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shivers v. Phoenix Police Department, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?