Taylor v. AFS Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02567
Filed: December 8, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 244 ) is granted. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and terminate this case. Consistent with the Court's prior ruling, Plaintiff shall file no motion for reconsideration of this order (Doc. 292 ). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/4/11. (SAT)
December 1, 2010 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Pla's Second Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 254 ) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/1/10. (SAT)
November 17, 2010 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Pla's 241 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/17/10. (SAT)
September 15, 2010 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 167 motion to dismiss is granted. The claims asserted against Defendant Argentum Group in the amended complaint are dismissed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 09/15/10. (ESL)
August 18, 2010 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Pla's 163 Motion for Sanctions for failure to issue a litigation hold and for spoilation and Pla's 164 Motion for Sanctions against defense counsel and individual witnesses are denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/18/10. (SAT)
July 26, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 142 motion for reconsideration for leave to exceed page limit is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 07/26/10. (ESL)
July 15, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 137 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/10.(TLJ)
June 1, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims; granting 30 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Pla shall file an Amended Complaint by 6/4/10. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/1/10.(LAD)
May 24, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part as set forth in this order 32 the parties' Joint Motion. The parties shall have until 6/11/10 to file (a) a notice of withdrawal from settlement and intent to proceed with count three, or (b) an unsealed settlement agreement and a separate notice requesting that the Court formally approve the settlement and dismiss count three with prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/24/10.(TLJ)
March 29, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 25 Motion for clarity regarding the Court's order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/29/10. (DTN)
March 24, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pla's 8 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied without prejudice. Pla may refile the motion after the close of discovery. Dft Argentum Group's motion 12 to dismiss and the individual Dfts' partial motion to dismiss are granted. Pla's motion 15 to dismiss counterclaims is granted. AFS shall have until April 2, 2010 to file amended counterclaims. Pla's motion for sanctions (Dkt. #15) is denied. The Court will set a scheduling conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. AFS Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?