Mattivi Brothers Leasing, Inc. v. Ecopath Industries, LLC

Case Number: 2:2010cv00049
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/2011.(NVO)
January 28, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $18,799.75. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/2011.(NVO)
December 9, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Mattivi Brothers Leasing Incorporated against Ecopath Industries LLC in the amount of $268,846.95, plus interest at the applicable legal rate until the judgement is satisfied. Plaintiff may file a motion for attorneys' fees pursuant to Local Rule 54.2. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/9/10. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattivi Brothers Leasing, Inc. v. Ecopath Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?