GRK Holdings, LLC v. First American Title Insurance Company et al

Case Number: 2:2010cv00050
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Reaffirming trial set for 5/22/2012 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall be in the courtroom ready to proceed no later than 8:30 a.m. on 5/22/2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/23/2012. (NVO)
December 13, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 132 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 142 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/13/2011.(NVO)
March 17, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 69 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/17/2011.(NVO)
January 6, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Quarles Defendants' 56 Motion to Dismiss (as stated in this order). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/6/11.(REW)
October 6, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that First American's 38 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The Court will grant First American's motion to dismiss the abuse of process claim (Count I) and deny the motion as to the other claims (Counts II, II I, and IV). The Mariscal Defendants' 39 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The Court will dismiss the abuse of process claim (Count I) and deny the motion with respect to the tortious interference claim (Count IV). The Quarles Defendants' 33 motion to dismiss is granted. GRK will have until 10/22/10 to file a third amended complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/06/10. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRK Holdings, LLC v. First American Title Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?