Lee v. Arizona, State of et al

Case Number: 2:2010cv00066
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. 55). Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint (Doc. 56). Granting the Application for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant (with client consent) (Doc 57). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/12/10.(KMG)
October 6, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by Arizona (Doc. 34) is GRANTED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by the County Defendants (Doc. 25) is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. The Moti on is granted only to the extent that (1) Plaintiff alleges a violation of Lee's right against self-incrimination, and to the extent that (2) Plaintiff seeks damages based on Lee's pain and suffering. The Motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/6/10.(LAD)
May 12, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dfts' Motions 13 , 15 to Dismiss the Estate's Original Compliant are DENIED as moot in light of the Amended Complaint. The Court will STAY its ruling on Dfts' remaining Motion 25 to Dismiss to afford Ms. Lee the opportu nity to demonstrate that she is the personal representative of her husband's Estate. FURTHER ORDERED that Ms. Lee shall provide documentary evidence establishing that she has been appointed as the personal representative of the Estate of Richard Arno Lee. FURTHER ORDERED that Ms. Lee is to file a MEMORANDUM with the relevant evidence on or before June 12, 2010. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/12/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?