Larson v. United Natural Foods West, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: George H Larson
Defendant: United Natural Foods West, Inc. and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv00185
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion for Attorney Fees. UNFI is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $91,732.75. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/23/2013.(DGC, nvo)
November 30, 2011 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 151 Motion for Attorney Fees. Motion may be refiled upon resolution of Plaintiff's appeal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/30/2011.(NVO)
July 29, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 116 Motion in Limine; granting 117 and 121 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment; denying 124 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/29/11.(TLJ)
December 20, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Defendant's request for a continuance 49 is granted. The parties shall file any summary judgment motions by 1/21/11; denying as moot 50 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 64 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 68 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 70 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/20/10.(TLJ)
August 26, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff granted leave to file his Amended Complaint 35 ; denying Defendant's 36 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/10.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. United Natural Foods West, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Natural Foods West, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Peder Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George H Larson
Represented By: Douglas Michael Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?