Araiza v. Mecham

Plaintiff: Alejandro Araiza
Defendant: Milton Kent Mecham
Case Number: 2:2010cv00188
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/1/2011.(NVO)
January 28, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 42 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct is VACATED and AMENDED to correct a typographical error on page 4, line 11 of Order 42 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/2011. (NVO)
December 1, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/1/10.(LSP)
October 20, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Amend is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/20/10.(ESL)
July 16, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/10.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Araiza v. Mecham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Kent Mecham
Represented By: Victoria Lea Orze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Araiza
Represented By: Marshall Scott Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?