Roosevelt Irrigation District v. Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District et al

Case Number: 2:2010cv00290
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2016 1163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court finds it appropriate to QUASH Plaintiff RID's Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Served by Roosevelt Irrigation District upon Third-Party Errol L. Montgomery, Inc. in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 1/14/2016. (DPS)
April 24, 2015 1000 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 854 Motion for Complete Disqualification Following Remand; and granting 967 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Conflict Defendants Motion for Complete Disqualification Following Remand. The Clerk of Court shall file Conflict Defendants' Lodged Proposed Conflict Defendants Supplemental Brief and Lodged Exhibit 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 4/23/2015.(BAR)
December 2, 2013 746 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 664 Motion to Disqualify Counsel and RIDs request for leave to file its Sur-Response in Opposition to Motion for Complete Disqualification of Gallagher and Kennedy (Doc. 718 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 11/27/13.(SMBE)
August 26, 2011 468 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Court grants Honeywell's Motion to Disqualify 120 ; grants Corning's Motion to Disqualify 129 ; grants Univar's Motion to Disqualify 131 ; grants SRP's Motion to Disqualify 132 ; grants Dolphin's Motion to Disqualify 133 ; and denies Arvin and Cooper's Motion to Disqualify 423 . Signed by Judge David A Ezra on 8/26/11.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roosevelt Irrigation District v. Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?