Underdog Trucking, L.L.C. et al v. Arizona Federal Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Underdog Trucking, L.L.C. and Reggie Anders
Defendant: Arizona Federal Credit Union and Western International Recovery Bureau
Case Number: 2:2010cv00521
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is kindly directed to terminate this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 08/17/10. (ESL)
August 2, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiff Underdog Trucking, L.L.C. is dismissed from this litigation without prejudice for failure to prosecute its case and to comply with court orders; that the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 08/03/10 at 1 0:00 a.m. is VACATED. It will be reset if Plaintiff Anders. lawsuit remains viable; that Plaintiff Reggie Anders shall show cause in writing on or before 08/12/10 why the Court should not dismiss this lawsuit without prejudice for failure to comply with court orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 08/02/10. (ESL)
May 27, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that, in view of Westerns Notice of Withdrawal, docket # 24, the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Defendant Western's Motion to Dismiss Claims by Underdog Trucking, LLC for Failure to State a Claim. (docket # 8 at 10-11). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Western's Motion to DismissCount One, docket # 8 at 11, is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is kindly directed to provide copies of this order to (1) Edward B. Mendy, Esq. and (2) Pla Reggie Anders' last known address. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/27/10.(LAD)
May 24, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, in view of AZFCU's notice of withdrawal 23 , the Clerk of Court shall terminate Defendant AZFCU's Motion to Dismiss Claims by Underdog Trucking, LLC for failure to state a claim 5 . ORDER that, in view of Plaintiffs' stip ulation 27 and 28 , Defendant AZFCU's Motion to Dismiss Count One 5 is granted and that Plaintiffs' allegations against AZFCU in Count One of the First Amended Complaint, 14 are hereby dismissed. ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint 15 as duplicative. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/21/10.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underdog Trucking, L.L.C. et al v. Arizona Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Underdog Trucking, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Wade Michael Burgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western International Recovery Bureau
Represented By: Keith Alan Olbricht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?