Howell et al v. Arizona Storage Inns et al

Plaintiff: William D Howell and Howell Law Firm, LLC
Defendant: Arizona Storage Inns, Kenneth Hess, Rachel Hess, Unknown Furlong, Maret Vessella, Unknown Vessella, Steven Little, John Furlong, Unknown Little, Sallie Scott, Unknown Scott and State Bar of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2010cv00790
Filed: April 9, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 93 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 94 Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk shall please enter judgment for defendants. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/6/11.(TLJ)
October 4, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting Defendant Arizona Storage Inns' 23 Motion to Dismiss Mr Howell's complaint for failure to state a claim and the claims against it are dismissed; denying Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; denying as moot Defendant Arizona Storage Inns' 29 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 10/1/10.(REW) Modified on 11/3/2010 added text of "opinion" (REW).
October 1, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as follows: all claims against the State Bar of Arizona are DISMISSED with prejudice, any claims against the State Bar Officials in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice leaving only claims against them in their individual capacities for resolution, and the request for sanctions is DENIED; denying as moot the 21 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 10/1/10.(REW) Modified on 11/3/2010 added omitted text of "Opinion" (REW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell et al v. Arizona Storage Inns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howell Law Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Storage Inns
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hess
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Hess
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maret Vessella
Represented By: Edward Calvin Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Vessella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Little
Represented By: Edward Calvin Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Furlong
Represented By: Edward Calvin Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Scott
Represented By: Edward Calvin Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of Arizona
Represented By: Edward Calvin Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?