Greer v. T. F. Thompson & Sons, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Dudley Greer
Defendant: T.F. Thompson & Sons, Inc. and Richardson Clemenson Sales Co.
Counter_claimant: T.F. Thompson & Sons, Inc. and Richardson Clemenson Sales Co.
Counter_defendant: Dudley Greer
Case Number: 2:2010cv00799
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying the Motion to Set Aside Judgment as to Community by Intervenor Judy Greer. (Doc. 174 .) Those earnings garnished by Garnishee Arizona Business Bank may be applied to the judgment of attorney fees and costs awar ded in favor of Thompson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Garnishee Arizona Business Bank to release the garnished funds to Thompson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination. (Doc. 139 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denyin g as moot the Motions for Oral Argument or Decision on Motion by Intervenor Judy Greer. (Docs. 178 , 179 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Status Conference currently set for September 16, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/26/13. (LAD)
December 11, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 132 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees. Directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Thompson for attorneys' fees in the amount of $221,534.50. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/11/12.(DMT)
November 3, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Thompson's Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 95 Thompson's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING Thompson's Motion for Summary Judgment on Greer's Claims. DISMISSING Thompson's Counterclaim. DENYING Thompson's Motion for Summary Judgment on Thompson's Counterclaim as moot. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/3/11.(DMT)
January 19, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Motion for Determination for Choiceof North Dakota Law (Doc. 36) is DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Cross-Motion Regarding Non-Application of North Dakota Law on Waiver of Warranties (Doc. 38) is GRANTED onlyto the extent that the Court will apply Arizona law in this case. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion for a Rule 56(f) Continuanceof the Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Non-Application of NorthDakota Law on Waiver of Warranties (Doc. 39) is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/19/2011.(TCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. T. F. Thompson & Sons, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: T.F. Thompson & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Curtis Cole, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Richardson Clemenson Sales Co.
Represented By: Jason Michael Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.F. Thompson & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Curtis Cole, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardson Clemenson Sales Co.
Represented By: Jason Michael Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dudley Greer
Represented By: Brian Imbornoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dudley Greer
Represented By: Brian Imbornoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?