Kizzee v. Walmart Inc.

Plaintiff: Damon Kizzee
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00802
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's motion for ruling (Doc. 55) is granted in part as stated above. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (Doc. 37) is denied. Plaintiff's motion to compel (Doc. 51) is denied as untimely. Plaintiff's motion for su mmary judgment (Doc. 47) is denied as untimely. Defendant's motions to strike (Docs. 53 and 58) are denied as moot. Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 39) is granted. Defendant's motion for summary disposition (Doc. 42) is granted. Plaintiff's motion for jury trial (Doc. 57) is denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/12/2011.(KMG)
March 4, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 25 Motion for Joinder is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 03/04/11.(ESL)
April 14, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff shall have until 5/3/10 to file an amended complaint; Plaintiff's Motion to proceed informa pauperis 4 is denied without prejudice, Plaintiff may re-file the motion if he files an amended complaint; the Clerk is directed to terminate this matter without further notice of Court if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/13/10.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kizzee v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Kizzee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?