Baca v. Callahan et al

Plaintiff: Carey M Baca
Defendant: La Paz, County of, State Title Agency, Inc, Steven R Callahan, James P Shubin, Debe Hayes, Cindie Douglas, Patricia L Wall, Lisa M Callahan, Shelly Baker, SRC Sundance, LLC, Unknown Parties and Arizona, State of
Case Number: 2:2010cv00885
Filed: April 21, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 50 is granted; the State of Arizona's Motion to Dismiss 72 is granted; Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 13 is dismissed with prejudice as to the claims against the following Def endants: Rosnagle, Shubin, Copper Canyon Enterprises, Schluter, Diamond Bay Investments, Steven Callahan, Lisa Callahan, and SRC Sundance. The only remaining claim is a negligence claim against Defendant Hayes. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Am end Complaint 81 is denied. ORDER that all other pending motions in this action 54 ; 56 ; 61 ; 63 ; and 82 are denied as moot. ORDER that Plaintiff must show good cause as to why Defendant Debe Hayes should not be dismissed on or before 9/8/11. ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to dismiss Defendant Debe Hayes and terminate this action if Plaintiff fails to comply (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/25/11.(TLJ)
July 20, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/20/10.(TLJ)
July 12, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the First Amended Complaint, Doc. 7 , with leave to file a Second Amended Complaint by August 11, 2010. FURTHER ORDERED that if Pla elects not to file a Second Amended Complaint by August 11, 2010, the Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss this action without further Order of the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that if Pla elects to file a Second Amended Complaint, the Complaint may not be served until and unless the Court screens the Second Amended Complaint pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/12/10. (KMG)
May 5, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 8, with leave to file an Amended Complaint by 6/4/10; if Plaintiff elects not to file an Amende d Complaint by 6/4/10, the Clerk shall dismiss this action without further Order of the Court; if Plaintiff elects to file an Amended Complaint, the Complaint may not be served until and unless the Court screens the Amended Complaint pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/5/10.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baca v. Callahan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Paz, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Title Agency, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Shubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debe Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindie Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia L Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRC Sundance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey M Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?