National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders et al v. Arizona, State of et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Laura Madera, Carmen Galindo, Fermin Leon, Manuel Siguenza, Moises Herrera, Joe Rivera and Unknown Parties
Defendant: Arizona, State of and Jan Brewer
Case Number: 2:2010cv00943
Filed: April 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2011 Filing 46 Minute Order: Civil Case Terminated re 45 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESL)
January 7, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, Manuel Siguenza, Unknown Parties (Galloni, Tania)
December 16, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE re Name Change and Substitution of Maricopa County Attorney by Richard M Romley. (White, Bruce)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting Defendants Brewer, Arizona, Goddard and Arpaio's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 30 , 31 , 26 ). Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for lack of standing. Plaintiffs are directed to file any amendments to their pleading within 30 calendar days of the date of this Order; granting Defendants Brewer and Arizona's 30 Motion to Dismiss the State of Arizona. All claims against the State of Arizona are dismissed with prejudice because Arizona has not waived sovereign immunity in this case; denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 35 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/10/10. (ESL)
September 23, 2010 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Amended Complaint,First MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Amended Complaint, filed by Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, Manuel Siguenza, Unknown Parties. (Galloni, Tania)
September 13, 2010 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Terry L Goddard. (Munns, Christopher)
September 13, 2010 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Amended Complaint,First MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Amended Complaint, filed by Terry L Goddard. (Munns, Christopher)
September 13, 2010 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Amended Complaint,First MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Amended Complaint, filed by Arizona, State of, Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
September 13, 2010 Filing 38 Reply re 30 MOTION to Dismiss Case in support of by Defendants Arizona, State of, Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Pursuant to the 36 stipulation between defendants State of Arizona and Janice K. Brewer and plaintiffs, it is ordered that replies in support of Arizona's motion to dismiss (doc. 30) are due by 09/13/10. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/02/10. (ESL)
August 31, 2010 Filing 36 STIPULATION by Arizona, State of, Jan Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
August 25, 2010 Filing 35 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Amended Complaint, by Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, Manuel Siguenza, Unknown Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Redlined), # 2 Exhibit - Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Clean Copy))(Galloni, Tania)
August 23, 2010 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Dismiss Case, 31 MOTION to Dismiss Case and 33 JOINDER in Motion to Dismiss filed by Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, Manuel Siguenza, Unknown Parties. (Galloni, Tania)
August 4, 2010 Filing 33 Joinder re 30 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Richard M Romley filed by Richard M Romley. (White, Bruce)
August 4, 2010 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Case Re Amended Complaint filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liddy, Thomas)
August 4, 2010 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Terry L Goddard. (Munns, Christopher)
August 4, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Arizona, State of, Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
July 30, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Cecile Longo on behalf of Richard M Romley (Longo, Anne)
July 29, 2010 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, Manuel Siguenza, Unknown Parties. (Galloni, Tania)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF ORDER in CV10-1413-PHX-SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/28/10. (note: see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
July 15, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Joseph M Arpaio. (Liddy, Thomas)
July 15, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ruth O'Grady on behalf of Terry L Goddard (O'Grady, Mary)
July 15, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Arthur Munns on behalf of Terry L Goddard (Munns, Christopher)
July 14, 2010 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Joseph M Arpaio, Jan Brewer, Terry L Goddard, Richard M Romley. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(MHA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 13, 2010 Filing 22 SUMMONS Submitted by Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, Manuel Siguenza, Unknown Parties (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Galloni, Tania)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 12, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098863 as to Tania Galloni. (BAS)
July 12, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Tania Galloni on behalf of plaintiffs Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, Manuel Siguenza, and Unknown Parties. (BAS)
July 12, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Michael M. Walker. (Walker, Michael)
June 30, 2010 Filing 19 Notice re Summarizing Matters Pending Before the Court Pursuant to Court's Order of June 25, 2010 by Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, Manuel Siguenza, Unknown Parties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sanchez-Calderon, William)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting the Pla's Motion to Transfer Related Case (docket #8 filed in CV10-926-PHX-SRB). Further ordered granting the Motion to Transfer Related Cases to this Court filed by Governor Brewer (docket 13 filed in CV10-926-PHX-SRB. Further ordered transferring the following cases to this Court: CV 10-249-TUC-DCB, CV 10-951-PHX-ROS, and CV 10-1061-PHX-JWS. Directing the Plas in CV 10-926-PHX-SRB, CV 10-943-PHX-SRB, CV 10-249-TUC-DCB, CV 10-951-PHX-ROS, and CV 10-1061-PHX-JWS to file a notice summarizing all pending motions in each case and the briefing status of those motions, no later than 5:00 p.m. on 06/29/10. It is further ordered that all future filings in the transferred cases shall bear the following case numbers: CV 10-249-TUC-SRB, CV 10-951-PHX-SRB, and CV 10-1061-PHX-SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 06/25/10. (ESL)
June 24, 2010 Filing 17 Notice re Response to Joinder in Requests for Consolidation by Jan Brewer (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Bouma, John)
June 23, 2010 Filing 16 Joinder IN REQUESTS FOR CONSOLIDATION by Intervenor Plaintiffs Flagstaff, City of, Tolleson, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of. (Rivera, Jose)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pending before the Court in CV10-0926-PHX-SRB are two Motions to Transfer Related Cases. One filed by Defendant Governor Janice K. Brewer (dkt #13) requesting to transfer CV10-0249-TUC-DCB and CV10-0951-PHX-ROS to this Court and one filed by Plaintiffs in case number CV10-1061-PHX-JWS (dkt. #8). Any party who wishes to file a response either in opposition or in support of the Motions to Transfer must do so by 5:00 p.m. on June 23, 2010. Any response filed shall be filed in case number CV 10-926-PHX SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/10. (MAW)
June 9, 2010 Filing 14 Notice re Consent to transfer related cases to Judge Bolton by Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, Manuel Siguenza, Unknown Parties (Sanchez-Calderon, William) Modified on 6/15/2010 CORRECTION: document does not contain case number (REW).
June 9, 2010 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY INJUNCTIVE AND FURTHER RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Joe Rivera, Moises Herrera, Carmen Galindo, Manuel Siguenza, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Fermin Leon, Unknown Parties, Laura Madera.(Sanchez-Calderon, William)
June 8, 2010 Remark as to attorney Jennifer Ale - removed from case for noncompliance with admissions procedures; party represented by other admitted counsel. (BAS)
May 27, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Bouma on behalf of Jan Brewer (Bouma, John)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 26, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097290 as to William Jose Sanchez-Calderon. (BAS)
May 26, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney William Jose Sanchez-Calderon on behalf of plaintiffs Carmen Galindo, Moises Herrera, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Joe Rivera, and Manuel Siguenza. (BAS)
May 25, 2010 Filing 9 Minute Order Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R. Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 10-943-PHX-SRB. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause deadline is hereby vacated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 24, 2010 Filing 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiffs show cause in writing on or before 6/4/10 why Plaintiffs' complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice. If Plaintiffs comply with the Court's 4/30/10 Order on or before 6/4/10 of if Plaintiffs have already done so but their consent or election has not yet been docketed by the Clerk, the undersigned will automatically discharge and vacate this OSC without imposing any sanctions. Show Cause Response due by 6/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/21/10. (TLJ)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their written election to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States district judge on or before Friday, May 14, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/30/10. (LAD)
April 29, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 1 Complaint filed by National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Manuel Siguenza, Laura Madera, Moises Herrera, Unknown Parties, Carmen Galindo, Joe Rivera, Fermin Leon. Description of deficiency: Required document(s) not attached. The following required documents were not attached: Civil Cover Sheet.(AMB)
April 29, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 15 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/14/2010 as to National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders. (AMB)
April 29, 2010 Filing 3 Magistrate Election Form Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate consent form)(AMB)
April 29, 2010 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lawrence O. Anderson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-10-0943-PHX-LOA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AMB)
April 29, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number PHX096317, filed by Joe Rivera, Moises Herrera, Carmen Galindo, Manuel Siguenza, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Fermin Leon, Laura Madera.(AMB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders et al v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders
Represented By: Jennifer Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Madera
Represented By: Jennifer Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Galindo
Represented By: Jennifer Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fermin Leon
Represented By: Jennifer Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Siguenza
Represented By: Jennifer Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Herrera
Represented By: Jennifer Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Rivera
Represented By: Jennifer Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?