Dougherty, et al v. Lincare Holdings, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Richard Dougherty and Catherine Dougherty
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Lincare, Inc. and Lincare Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00978
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial hearing by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/10/2011.(NVO)
April 11, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for determination that Wisconsin law applies to this matter. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/11/2011.(NVO)
August 13, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Defendant Lincare Holdings, Inc's(LHI) Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/13/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dougherty, et al v. Lincare Holdings, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincare, Inc.
Represented By: Kesha Anesta Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincare Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kesha Anesta Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dougherty
Represented By: Joseph Patrick McGurk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Dougherty
Represented By: Joseph Patrick McGurk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?