Corwin, et al v. Gorilla Companies LLC, et al

Appellee: K Gunnar Bjorklund, Gorilla Companies LLC, Professional Event Management, LLC, Gorilla Equipment LLC, Gorilla Power Systems LLC, Gorilla Motorsports LLC, Gorilla Fuel, LLC, Gorilla Quick Cash LLC, Blue Room Creative, LLC and Sverica International Capital LLC
Appellant: 13 Holdings, LLC, Robb M Corwin and Jillian C Corwin
Debtor: Gorilla Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01029
Filed: May 11, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Attorney Fees. Appellants are awareded $127,058.35 in attorneys's fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/14/2011.(NVO)
September 8, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Corwins' Motion for rehearing. The Corwin Parties' 97 motion for entry of mandate, or in the alternative, to stay all proceedings in the bankruptcy court for 30 days after ruling on the motion for rehearing is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted with respect to the request for a 30-day stay in the Bankruptcy Court. The motion otherwise is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/8/11.(DMT)
July 1, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appellant's motion for expedited review 85 and emergency motion for leave to file motion for rehearing 86 are granted. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged proposed motion for rehearing 87 . Gorilla shall have until 7/15/11 to file a response to the motion for rehearing. Appellants shall file a reply by 7/22/11. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/1/11.(TLJ)
June 14, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Appellants' Motion for Rehearing. The motion is granted with respect to the $57,986 adjustment to EBITDA for the costs of reclassifying independent contractors to employees and denied as to th e unjust enrichment claim. The Courts March 11, 2011 order (Doc. 75) affirming in part and reversing in part the judgment entered by the bankruptcy court is amended as follows: The bankruptcy court's judgment is reversed with respect to the $57,986 adjustment to EBITDA for employee reclassification. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/14/11.(LSP)
March 11, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that the judgment entered by the bankruptcy court on March 22, 2010 (Doc. 1 at 17-21; ER 112) is affirmed in part and reversed in part. The judgment is reversed with respect to (1) Gorilla's claims for fraud, negligent misrepresentation, breach of contract, and breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, (2) the awards of $1 million in lost profits and $1,742,034.15 in attorneys' fees, costs, and related non-taxable expenses (plus applicable interest ), and (3) the $203,429 deduction from the EBITDA calculation for employee reclassification for the post-closing period. The judgment is affirmed on Gorilla's claim for unjust enrichment and, with respect to the EBITDA calculation, the � 36;297,328 depreciation expense, the $177,000 NFL invoice, and the $57,986 for employee reclassification for the pre-closing period. 2. The case is remanded to the bankruptcy court for further proceedings consistent with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/11/11. (DMT)
October 14, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the bankruptcy court's resolution of the core/noncore issue is affirmed. Appellants shall file their opening brief on the remaining merits of this appeal by November 3, 2010. The response brief shall be filed by November 24, 2010, and the reply by December 8, 2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/14/10. (DMT)
July 6, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Appellants' 9 Motion to Bifurcate Appeal; the parties shall first address whether the bankruptcy court erred in finding Gorilla's claims to be core and entering final judgment; Appellants shall file an opening brief on this issue by 7/16/10; the response brief is due 7/30/10; the reply 8/6/10. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/5/10.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corwin, et al v. Gorilla Companies LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: K Gunnar Bjorklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gorilla Companies LLC
Represented By: Craig Solomon Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Professional Event Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gorilla Equipment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gorilla Power Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gorilla Motorsports LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gorilla Fuel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gorilla Quick Cash LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Blue Room Creative, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sverica International Capital LLC
Represented By: Edwin Brady Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: 13 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robb M Corwin
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jillian C Corwin
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gorilla Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Solomon Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?