M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank v. Lerner

Plaintiff: M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank
Defendant: Glen J Lerner
Case Number: 2:2010cv01081
Filed: May 18, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/25/2011.(NVO)
December 16, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 25 motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is denied. The motions to dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) (Docs. 23 , 24 ) are granted. The counterclaim filed by Glen Lerner (Doc. 16) is dismissed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/10. (ESL)
August 9, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court will set a case management conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/9/2010.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank v. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank
Represented By: Krystal Michelle Aspey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen J Lerner
Represented By: Todd Feltus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?