Vollmer et al v. Present et al

Plaintiff: Brian Vollmer and Peter M. Kane
Defendant: Randall C Present, Donald Tomnitz, John Stumpf, Parker Kennedy, R K Arnold and Sanjiv Das
Case Number: 2:2010cv01182
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Wells Fargo's 62 Motion to Quash Lis Pendens is granted in part and denied in part; It is further ordered that Wells Fargo's motion as to quashing the lis pendens is granted; It is further ordered that Wells Fargo 9;s motion as to statutory damages is denied without prejudice. Directing the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case. This case has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future documents filed shall reflect the complete case number: CV10-1182-PHX-GMS. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 04/07/11.(ESL)
January 4, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER (as to date Plas shall file an Amended Complaint) re 53 Order, 49 Order - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Dfts John G. Stumpf, R.K. Arnold, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Mortgage Electronic Registration System's Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. 6 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting Dfts Randall C. Present and Donald Tomnitz's Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Joinder in Dfts Stumpf, Arnold, Wells Fargo, and MERS's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. 20 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot John G. Stumpf, R.K. Arnold, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Mortgage Electronic Registration System's Dfts Motion to Stay or Continue Their Responses to Pla's Abusive Filings. (Doc. 46 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying Plas' Brian Vollmer and Peter M. Kane's Motion to Remand to State Court. (Doc. 11 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting Plas' Brian Vollmer and Peter M. Kane's Motion to Enter a New and/or Amended Complaint for this Court&# 039;s and All Parties'Clarification, (Doc. 25 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting Plas' Brian Vollmer and Peter M. Kane's Motion to Amend Complaint, (Doc. 26 ). FURTHER ORDERED that should Plas choose to file an amended complaint, they must do so no later than January 20, 2011. Should Plas fail to file an amended complaint by close of business on January 20, 2011, IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to close this case and enter jgm accordingly without further notice to Plas.F URTHER ORDERED denying as moot Plas' Brian Vollmer and Peter M. Kane's Omnibus Motion, (Doc. 34 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying Plas' Brian Vollmer and Peter M. Kane's Motion to Charge Dfts and Dfts' Atty's with Fraud and Ot her Crimes Pursuant to Federal and State Law as Evidenced by the Forensic Examination, (Doc. 36 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying Plas' Brian Vollmer and Peter M. Kane's Motion to Strike All of Dfts' Motions for Dfts' Attys' Violat ions of: L.R.Civ.P. Rule 83.3 and F.R.Civ.P. Rule 11 and This Court's Violation of L.R.Civ.P. Rule 83.5 and Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(3/4) and Appointment of Fiduciary, (Doc. 37 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Plas' Brian Vollmer and Peter M. Kane's Motion to Deny all Joinders. (Doc. 45 ). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/4/11. (SAT)
December 1, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dfts' 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting Dfts' Rule 12(b)(2) 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Joinder in Dfts Stumpf, Arnold, Wells Fargo, and MERS's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss; denying as m oot Dfts' 46 Motion to Stay or Continue Their Responses to Pla's Abusive Filings; denying Plas' 11 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting Plas' 25 Motion to Enter a New and/or Amended Complaint for this Court's and A ll Parties' Clarification; granting Plas' 26 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying as moot Plas' 34 Omnibus Motion; denying Pla' 36 Motion to Charge Dfts and Dfts' Attorney's with Fraud and Other Crimes Pursuant to Fed eral and State Law as Evidenced by the Forensic Examination; denying Plas' 37 Motion to Strike All of Dfts' Motions for Dfts' Attorneys' Violations of: L.R.Civ.P. Rule 83.3 and F.R.Civ.P. Rule 11 and This Court's Violation of L.R.Civ.P. Rule 83.5 and Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(3/4) and Appointment of Fiduciary; denying as moot Plas' 45 Motion to Deny all Joinders. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/30/10. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vollmer et al v. Present et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Vollmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter M. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall C Present
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Tomnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stumpf
Represented By: Michael Jeffrey Coccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R K Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjiv Das
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?