Cestro v. Dovenmuele Mortgage, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Lida Cestro
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC, LNV Corporation, MGC Mortgage Incorporated, Executive Trustee Services LLC, Lender Services Direct Incorporated, Dovenmuele Mortgage Incorporated and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv01507
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the First Amended Complaint as to Defendant Lender Services Direct, Inc., is dismissed with prejudice for lack of prosecution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 58 LNV Corp.'s Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that 10 Stipulated Order Enjoining Trustee's Sale of Real Property is vacated. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant LNV Corporation and against Plaintiff and that Plaintiff take nothing. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/16/11.(LSP)
August 1, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant LNV Corporation's Motion toDismiss First Amended Complaint With Prejudice (Doc. 38) is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause by August 15, 2011, whyher First Amended Complaint as t o Lender Services Direct, Inc., not be dismissed with prejudice for lack of prosecution. If Plaintiff does not respond to this Order by August 15, 2011, the First Amended Complaint as to Lender Services Direct, Inc., will be dismissed and the case terminated without further notice. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/1/11.(LAD)
November 9, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant LNV Corporation's 26 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is granted to the extent it seeks dismissal of Dft LNV Corporation with respect to Counts I and II of Pla's complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla is given leave to amend her complaint by 12/13/2010. If no amended complaint is filed by 12/13/2010, the Clerk shall enter jgm dismissing this action with prejudice as to Dft LNV Corp. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/9/10. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cestro v. Dovenmuele Mortgage, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Colt B Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LNV Corporation
Represented By: Michael R Scheurich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGC Mortgage Incorporated
Represented By: Michael R Scheurich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Trustee Services LLC
Represented By: Colt B Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lender Services Direct Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovenmuele Mortgage Incorporated
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Colt B Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lida Cestro
Represented By: Gary Thomas Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?