Stejic v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Milan Stejic
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC, Shelter Mortgage Company LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv01547
Filed: July 22, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that MERSCORP Holdings, Inc.'s and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment against the Mr. Stejic (Doc. 53 is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the stipulation to dismiss Aurora Loan Services, LL C, (Doc. 2072, in MD-09-2119) is granted. Aurora Loan Services, LLC, is dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not enter judgment at this time. The Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order in both the MD case number, and the member case number listed. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/27/16. (MDL-09-2119)(MAP)
December 21, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Defendant Aurora Loan Services, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. See document for details re Lead Case: MDL 09-2119-PHX-JAT. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/21/15.(LSP)
August 5, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in both cases listed on this Order.. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/4/15. (MDL-09-2119)(MAP)
June 1, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for oral argument is denied because the parties have been given multiple opportunities to address the issue of concern to the Court and have re peatedly failed to do so. Thus, the Court finds that oral argument would not aid the Court's decisional process on this topic because the parties will not address it. FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order in both cases listed on this Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/28/15. (MDL-09-211--PHX)(MAP)
March 20, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Milan Stejic's Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Stejic (Doc. 1611, filed in MDL-2119) is denied. FURTHER the Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order in MDL 09-2119-PHX-JAT and CV 10-1547-PHX-JAT. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/20/12. (Duplicate Order filed in Lead MDL-2119, Doc. 1715)(MAP)
July 22, 2010 1 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting/denying in parte Motion to Remand Certain Claims (Doc. #457, in MDL-2119). ORDERED that with respect to Stejic (CV 10-51-PHX-JAT), claim 1 (wrongful foreclosure), claim 2 (breach of contract), claim 3 (breach of the covenant of good f aith and fair dealing), claim 4 (fraud), and part of claim 6 (injunctive relief) remain with the undersigned as part of the MDL; claim 5 (consumer fraud act), and part of claim 6 (injunctive relief) are remanded to Judge Campbell; to accomplish the b ifurcation of this case within this district, the Clerk of the Court is directed to bifurcate Stejic into two cases; the Clerk of the Court shall draw and assign a new Phoenix case number to the portion of the Stejic case that is remaining with the u ndersigned and the Clerk of the Court shall consolidate that case number into the MDL as a member case. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer the original Stejic case number back to Judge Campbell...See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/22/10. (Original Order filed in MDL-2119 (Doc. 964)) (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stejic v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milan Stejic
Represented By: Beth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mortgage Company LLC
Represented By: Roland P Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Robert M Brochin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?