Sanchez v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mark Sanchez
Defendant: United Parcel Service Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv01586
Filed: July 27, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 158 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; granting 163 Motion to Correct the Record. The Clerk shall correct the record to show a Transcript Order on July 17, 2013. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/24/13. (LAD)
April 8, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 118 Motion to Stay; final conference and trial dates are vacated, to be reset at a hearing to be scheduled by the court through a separate order;Court directs teh Clerk not to accept for filing any document in this case that bears the name or signature of Naida B. Axford.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/8/2013.(TCA)
November 19, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendant's 88 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/19/12.(REW)
August 10, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs motion to strike (Doc. 34) is denied. 2. Defendant Naugle's motion to dismiss (Doc. 28) is granted as stated above. 3. UPSs motion to dismiss counts 4-11 (Doc. 25) is granted in part and denied in part as stated above. 4. Plaintiff's motions at Doc. 30 are denied as stated above. 5. The Court will set a scheduling conference by separate order. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/10/11.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sanchez
Represented By: Thomas Timothy Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?