Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation v. Acella Pharmaceuticals Incorporated

Plaintiff: Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation
Defendant: Acella Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv01780
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2012 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 280 Motion for Attorney Fees FURTHER ORDERED granting 290 Acella's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Memoranda on Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and 294 Medicis' Joinder to Acella's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. FURTHER ORDERED granting 292 Acella's Motion to File Memorandum in Support of Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Under Seal, Medicis' 296 Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum of Law in O pposition to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Under Seal, and Acella's 298 Motion to File Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Under Seal. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/14/12.(MAP)
November 3, 2011 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Acella's 250 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court holds that all the asserted claims of the Patent are invalid as obvious. The Clerk therefore will enter judgment for Defendant Acella; Granting judgment to Defendant/ Counter-Plaintiff Acella on its Counter-Claim for Declaratory Relief (Doc. 178) because the Court has found the Patent invalid; vacating the Final Pretrial Conference set for 01/17/12 and the trial set for 01/24/12; denying as moot Medicis's 271 Motion for Leave to Supplement Brief; denying as moot Medicis's 274 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/03/11. (ESL)
September 27, 2011 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 263 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of its Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall file the Reply currently lodged at Docket 264 , except that the Clerk will not file Exhibit C to the Prop osed Reply because of the Court's denial of the Motion to Seal. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Acella's 265 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 5.6(e), the Court will strike the the Sealed Lodged Proposed Exhibit at Docket 266 . Acella shall have five (5) days from the date of this Order to resubmit Exhibit C to the Reply for filing in the public record. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/27/11.(MAP)
September 9, 2011 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 254 Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall file under seal the documents currently lodged at Docket 255 . FURTHER ORDERED granting 257 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of its Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Acella's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall file into the record the documents currently lodged at Dockets 252 and 253 . Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/8/11.(MAP)
August 31, 2011 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting/denying in part 241 Motion for Leave to File its Unredacted Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law and Accompanying Statement of Material Facts Under Seal. ORDERED denying Motion with regard to Acella's Proposed Unre dacted Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support. The Clerk therefore shall strike the proposed document at docket 242 . ORDERED granting the Motion in all other respects. The Clerk therefore shall file under seal the proposed document lodged at docket 243 . Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/31/11.(MAP)
August 4, 2011 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 233 Motion to Seal Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law and Accompanying Statement of Material Facts. The Clerk shall strike the Proposed documents at Docket entries 234 and 235. Within five days of the d ate of this Order, either Acella shall resubmit the stricken documents for filing into the public record or the parties may file a Stipulation containing compelling reasons for sealing the Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and acco mpanying Statement of Material Facts and/or for sealing only certain Exhibits to the Statements of Material Facts. FURTHER ORDERED granting 230 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk shall file into the record the Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law (Redacted) currently lodged at docket entry 231 . Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/3/11.(MAP)
July 29, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING Plaintiff's Second Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Motion to Extend Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Taking Depositions Regarding Willfulness (Doc. 219). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/29/11.(LAD)
March 16, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 127 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint within 4 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/16/11.(REW)
March 2, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion to Seal; granting 82 Motion to Seal; denying for failure to show good cause 87 Motion to Seal; denying for failure to show good cause 94 Motion to Seal; granting 107 Motion to Seal; granting 125 Motion to Seal; granting 138 Motion to Seal; granting 145 Motion to Seal. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/2/11.(LAD)
February 9, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 , 72 Acella's Motion for Reconsideration but denying all relief requested by Acella. The Court will not enter a stay pending reexamination at this time. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/9/11.(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation v. Acella Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation
Represented By: Brian J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acella Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?