Nichols v. Bosco et al

Plaintiff: John-Raymond Nichols
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group Incorporated, MVB Mortgage Corporation, Michael A Bosco, Jr, John G Stumpf, John Kanas, Maryann Tomczyk, Bank United Financial Corporation, Gary Huntoon, American Financial Resources Incorporated, Unknown Parties, Ellen Alemany and Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2010cv01872
Filed: September 1, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' 97 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $12,565.00. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 07/07/11.(ESL)
March 4, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' motion to dismiss (docs. 69 , 70 , 72 , 85 ) and dismissing the complaint with prejudice as to all defendants, moving and nonmoving. Defendants Citizens Financial Groups, Inc. and Ellen Alemany's motion for su mmary disposition is therefore moot (doc. 93 ). It is further ordered that defendants' previous motions to dismiss the original complaint and first amended complaint are moot (docs. 15 , 16 , 19 , 20 , 28 , 29 ). The clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 03/03/11. (ESL)
November 23, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING defendant's Motion to strike plaintiff's request for production of documents (doc. 44). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's Motion to allow electronic filing by a party without an attorney (doc. 64). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/23/10.(KMG)
November 15, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 39 motion to amend, and denying plaintiff's 23 motion to sequester the original note. In addition, since plaintiff has recently filed a duplicate first amended complaint (doc. 58), IT IS ORDERED that the dupli cate first amended complaint will be stricken (doc. 58). Finally, for clarity purposes, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the red line version of the second amended complaint (doc. 59) will be the applicable complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/15/10. (ESL)
October 18, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File his First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff has 14 days to file and serve the amended pleading on all parties. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/18/10.(TLJ)
October 1, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/1/10. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Bosco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVB Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Bosco, Jr
Represented By: Leonard J McDonald, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G Stumpf
Represented By: John Michael DeStefano, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kanas
Represented By: Leonard J McDonald, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryann Tomczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank United Financial Corporation
Represented By: Leonard J McDonald, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Huntoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Financial Resources Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Alemany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: John Michael DeStefano, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John-Raymond Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?